Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB763 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Toth (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 763
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the handling of illicit alcoholic beverages seized by a
 peace officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 103.06, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 103.06.  BEVERAGE SEIZED BY PEACE OFFICER [DELIVERED TO
 COMMISSION]. Any alcoholic beverage, its container, and its
 packaging which has been seized by a peace officer, as provided in
 Section 103.03:
 (1)  [of this code,] may not be replevied; and
 (2)  shall be:
 (A)  destroyed or disposed of by a peace officer;
 or
 (B)  [be] delivered to the commission for
 immediate public or private sale in the manner the commission
 considers best.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *