Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB769 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/03/2021

                    By: Middleton, Hunter, Lozano, Dominguez, H.B. No. 769
 et al.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the Texas Windstorm Insurance
 Association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2210.063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.063.  LOCATION OF ASSOCIATION HEADQUARTERS. The
 headquarters of the association must be located in a first tier
 coastal county or second tier coastal county.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2210.351, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  The association may use a rate filed by the association
 without prior commissioner approval if:
 (1)  the filing is made not later than the 30th day
 before the date of any use or delivery for use of the rate;
 (2)  the filed rate does not exceed [105 percent of] the
 rate in effect on the date on which the filing is made; and
 (3)  [the filed rate does not reflect a rate change for
 an individual rating class that is 10 percent higher than the rate
 in effect for that rating class on the date on which the filing is
 made; and
 [(4)]  the commissioner has not disapproved the filing
 in writing, advising of the reasons for the disapproval and the
 criteria the association is required to meet to obtain approval.
 (f)  The association may not file a rate under this section
 that exceeds the rate in effect on the date on which the filing is
 made unless two-thirds of the board of directors votes to approve
 the rate.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter H, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2210.3512 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.3512.  REQUIREMENT FOR VOTE ON RATE FILING. The
 board of directors may not vote on a proposed rate filing if there
 is a vacancy on the board.
 SECTION 4.  Section 2210.352, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (a-3) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  The association may use a rate filed by the
 association under this section without prior commissioner approval
 if:
 (1)  the filing is made not later than the 30th day
 before the date of any use or delivery for use of the rate; and
 (2)  the filed rate does not exceed [105 percent of] the
 rate used by the association in effect on the date on which the
 filing is made[; and
 [(3)  the filed rate does not reflect a rate change for
 an individual rating class that is 10 percent higher than the rate
 in effect for that rating class on the date on which the filing is
 made].
 (a-3)  The association may not file a rate under this section
 that exceeds the rate in effect on the date on which the filing is
 made unless two-thirds of the board of directors votes to approve
 the rate.
 SECTION 5.  Section 2210.452(c), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  At the end of each calendar year or policy year, the
 association shall use the net gain from operations of the
 association, including all premium and other revenue of the
 association in excess of incurred losses, operating expenses,
 public security obligations, and public security administrative
 expenses, to make payments to the trust fund or pay public security
 obligations, giving priority to the obligations with the highest
 interest rates[, procure reinsurance, or use alternative risk
 financing mechanisms, or to make payments to the trust fund and
 procure reinsurance or use alternative risk financing mechanisms].
 SECTION 6.  Section 2210.453, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (f) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  In determining the probable maximum loss under
 Subsection (b), the association:
 (1)  may not consider the cost of providing loss
 adjustments;
 (2)  shall, to the extent possible, contract with any
 disinterested third parties necessary to execute any hurricane risk
 simulation models that were executed in the preceding storm season;
 (3)  shall, if the association is unable to contract
 for the execution of a hurricane risk simulation model described by
 Subdivision (2), contract with any disinterested third party
 necessary to execute a hurricane risk simulation model that is
 substantially similar to the model for which the association is
 unable to contract under Subdivision (2);
 (4)  may contract with any disinterested third parties
 to execute hurricane risk simulation models in addition to the
 models required by Subdivisions (2) and (3);
 (5)  shall provide to a third party executing a
 hurricane risk simulation model any information necessary to comply
 with this subsection;
 (6)  may not use a combination of hurricane risk
 simulation models to determine the probable maximum loss; and
 (7)  may use only the hurricane risk simulation model
 that produces the lowest probable maximum loss.
 (b-2)  Any information produced in compliance with
 Subsection (b-1) shall be made publicly available on the Internet
 website of the association.
 (f)  The association may not purchase reinsurance under this
 section from an insurer or broker involved in the execution of the
 hurricane risk simulation model on which the association relies in
 determining the probable maximum loss applicable for the period
 covered by the reinsurance.
 SECTION 7.  Section 2210.611, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.611.  EXCESS REVENUE COLLECTIONS AND INVESTMENT
 EARNINGS. Revenue collected in any calendar year from a premium
 surcharge under Sections 2210.612, 2210.613, and 2210.6131 that
 exceeds the amount of the public security obligations and public
 security administrative expenses payable in that calendar year and
 interest earned on the funds may, in the discretion of the
 association, be:
 (1)  used to pay public security obligations payable in
 the subsequent calendar year, offsetting the amount of the premium
 surcharge that would otherwise be required to be levied for the year
 under this subchapter; or
 (2)  used to redeem or purchase outstanding public
 securities[; or
 [(3)  deposited in the catastrophe reserve trust fund].
 SECTION 8.  Section 2210.664(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than November 15, 2022 [2020], the board shall
 deliver a [the] report prepared under Subsection (a) to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives.
 SECTION 9.  Section 2210.665, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.665.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 10.  Sections 14(c) and (d), Chapter 790 (H.B.
 1900), Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2023 [2021], the windstorm
 insurance legislative oversight board shall submit to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the Texas Department of Insurance a written
 report of a [the] study conducted under this section. The report
 must include the findings and legislative recommendations of the
 board.
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2024 [2022].
 SECTION 11.  Section 2210.063, Insurance Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association
 beginning January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 12.  Sections 2210.351 and 2210.352, Insurance Code,
 as amended by this Act, apply only to a rate filed by the Texas
 Windstorm Insurance Association with the Texas Department of
 Insurance on or after the effective date of this Act. A rate filed
 with the Texas Department of Insurance before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before
 that date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 13.  The Texas Department of Insurance shall amend
 the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association's plan of operation to
 conform to the changes in law made by this Act not later than the
 60th day after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 14.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.