Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB769 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Middleton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 769
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 19, 2021, rereferred to
 Committee on Jurisprudence; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 769 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the Texas Windstorm Insurance
 Association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2210.3512 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.3512.  REQUIREMENT FOR VOTE ON RATE FILING. The
 board of directors may not vote on a proposed rate filing if there
 is a vacancy on the board.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 2210.453, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.453.  FUNDING LEVELS; REINSURANCE AND ALTERNATIVE
 RISK FINANCING MECHANISMS; REINSURANCE FROM CERTAIN INSURER OR
 BROKER PROHIBITED.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2210.453, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The association may not purchase reinsurance under this
 section from an insurer or broker involved in the execution of a
 catastrophe model on which the association relies in:
 (1)  determining the probable maximum loss applicable
 for the period covered by the reinsurance; or
 (2)  adopting rates under Section 2210.355.
 SECTION 4.  The Texas Department of Insurance shall amend
 the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association's plan of operation to
 conform to the changes in law made by this Act not later than the
 60th day after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *