Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB871 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2021

                    By: Morrison, Gates (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 871
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021;
 April 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 11, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the municipal fees charged to certain air conditioning
 and refrigeration contractors.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 1302, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1302.304 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1302.304.  MUNICIPAL FEES. (a) A municipality may not
 charge a registration fee to a person who holds a license issued
 under Subchapter F for:
 (1)  work performed in the municipality; or
 (2)  notice provided under Section 1302.262.
 (b)  This section does not prohibit a municipality from
 charging a building permit fee.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *