Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB876 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 876
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 10, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees charged by certain persons for the method used for
 payments made under an agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 116 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 116. FEES FOR CERTAIN PAYMENT METHODS
 Sec. 116.0001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Payee" means an individual who resides in this
 state or a corporation, trust, partnership, association, or other
 private legal entity authorized to do business in this state that
 receives money as payment under an agreement.
 (2)  "Person" means an individual, corporation, trust,
 partnership, association, or other private legal entity.
 Sec. 116.0002.  FEE FOR CERTAIN PAYMENTS BY PAPER CHECK
 PROHIBITED. (a) A person that makes a payment to a payee may not
 charge an additional fee to the payee because the payee elects to
 receive the payment by paper check instead of by an automated
 clearinghouse transaction or other electronic funds transfer.
 (b)  A provision in a contract permitting a person to charge
 or collect a fee from a payee in violation of Subsection (a) is void
 and unenforceable.
 SECTION 2.  To the extent of a conflict between Section
 116.0002(a), Business & Commerce Code, as added by this Act, and a
 provision of a contract entered into before the effective date of
 this Act, the provision of the contract prevails.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *