Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB900 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Huberty (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 900
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the liability of a landlord for damages resulting from
 the execution of a writ of possession in an eviction suit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.0061, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  A landlord is not liable for damages to the tenant
 resulting from the execution of a writ of possession by an officer
 under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.0061(i), Property Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to the execution of a writ of possession
 issued in an eviction suit filed on or after the effective date of
 this Act. Execution of a writ of possession issued in an eviction
 suit filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *