Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB911 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Patterson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 911
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specially marked driver's licenses and
 personal identification certificates to veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.102, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The department shall establish and maintain on the
 department's Internet website forms and procedures by which a
 veteran or disabled veteran may request and provide the proof
 required for a designation on a personal identification certificate
 or renewal of a personal identification certificate with a
 designation under this section by submitting a form and the
 required proof electronically on the department's Internet
 website.
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.1235, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The department shall establish and maintain on the
 department's Internet website forms and procedures by which a
 veteran or disabled veteran may request and provide the proof
 required for a designation on a driver's license or renewal of a
 driver's license with a designation under this section by
 submitting a form and the required proof electronically on the
 department's Internet website.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2022, the Department of
 Public Safety of the State of Texas shall establish and maintain on
 the department's Internet website the forms and procedures required
 by Sections 521.102(g) and 521.1235(g), Transportation Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *