Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB912 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 912
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for recipients
 of the Borinqueneers Congressional Gold Medal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.315, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (r) to read as follows:
 (r)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Borinqueneers Congressional Gold Medal.  License
 plates issued under this subsection must include the Borinqueneers
 Congressional Gold Medal emblem and must include the words
 "Borinqueneers Congressional Gold Medal" at the bottom of each
 plate.  License plates issued under this subsection that are not
 personalized must also include the letter "B" as a prefix or suffix
 to the numerals on each plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *