By: Dutton (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 981 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0, one present not voting; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 981 By: West A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies program at Texas Southern University. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 61.06695 to read as follows: Sec. 61.06695. STUDY ON RELIGIOUS STUDIES PROGRAM AT TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies program that offers bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern University. (b) Not later than December 1, 2022, the board shall submit to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education and the board of regents of Texas Southern University a report on the results of the study. (c) This section expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *