Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB981 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    H.B. No. 981


 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies
 program at Texas Southern University.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.06695 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.06695.  STUDY ON RELIGIOUS STUDIES PROGRAM AT TEXAS
 SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY. (a) The board shall conduct a study on the
 feasibility of establishing a religious studies program that offers
 bachelor's, master's, and doctoral degrees at Texas Southern
 University.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the board shall submit
 to each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction
 over higher education and the board of regents of Texas Southern
 University a report on the results of the study.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 981 was passed by the House on May 8,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 110, Nays 29, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 981 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 107, Nays 34,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 981 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor