Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB999 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2021

                    By: Bernal, Guillen, Patterson H.B. No. 999
 (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez, West)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 999 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of individual graduation committees for certain
 high school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.0258, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (h-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), this section applies
 to any student in grade 12 during the 2020-2021 school year
 regardless of whether the student meets the criteria described by
 Subsection (a). The commissioner may by rule apply this section to
 students in grade 12 during the 2021-2022 school year in the same
 manner under this subsection, if the commissioner determines the
 application of this section to those students is appropriate.  This
 subsection expires September 1, 2022.
 (h-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (h), in determining
 whether a student described by Subsection (a-1) is qualified to
 graduate, an individual graduation committee is not required to
 consider criteria under Subsection (h) relating to the student's
 performance on an end-of-course assessment instrument administered
 under Section 39.023. This subsection expires September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *