Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB999 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2021

                    H.B. No. 999


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of individual graduation committees for certain
 high school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.0258, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (h-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), this section applies
 to any student in grade 12 during the 2020-2021 school year
 regardless of whether the student meets the criteria described by
 Subsection (a). This subsection expires September 1, 2022.
 (h-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (h), in determining
 whether a student described by Subsection (a-1) is qualified to
 graduate, an individual graduation committee is not required to
 consider criteria under Subsection (h) relating to the student's
 performance on an end-of-course assessment instrument administered
 under Section 39.023. This subsection expires September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 999 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 999 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 999 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor