Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR99 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Canales, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.J.R. No. 99
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a county to
 finance the development or redevelopment of transportation or
 infrastructure in unproductive, underdeveloped, or blighted areas
 in the county; authorizing the issuance of bonds and notes.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1-g(b), Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The legislature by general law may authorize a county or
 an incorporated city or town to issue bonds or notes to finance the
 development or redevelopment of an unproductive, underdeveloped,
 or blighted area within the county, city, or town and to pledge for
 repayment of those bonds or notes increases in ad valorem tax
 revenues imposed on property in the area by the county, city, or
 town and other political subdivisions.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing a county to
 finance the development or redevelopment of transportation or
 infrastructure in unproductive, underdeveloped, or blighted areas
 in the county."
 * * * * *