Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HR821 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                    H.R. No. 821


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life well lived may help to comfort the
 loved ones of Caroline Virginia Ellwood Sullivan of San Antonio,
 who passed away on March 29, 2021, at the age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, The former Carol Ellwood was born in Mexico City on
 August 15, 1947; she attended Limestone College in Gaffney, South
 Carolina, and on August 10, 1968, she married John Paul Sullivan in
 her hometown of Mexico City; her husband's 21-year career in the
 United States Army took the couple abroad to Turkey and Panama, as
 well as to various postings in Arizona, Texas, North Carolina, and
 Washington, D.C.; after Mr. Sullivan retired from his military
 career, they resided in Eagle Pass and in San Antonio; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Sullivan was the loving mother of two children,
 Caroline Cecelia and John Richard; she was also devoted to her
 Episcopalian faith, and she volunteered her time with the Altar
 Guild; other organizations that benefited from her involvement were
 the Girl Scouts, Rotary International, and the Library Foundation
 of Eagle Pass; and
 WHEREAS, Always warm and welcoming, Mrs. Sullivan embodied
 the saying "Mi casa es tu casa" as she graciously opened her home to
 extended family, friends, neighbors, and others, and she was a
 superb cook who was especially known for her enchiladas suizas; she
 blessed those around her through her many acts of kindness, as well
 as through her deep loyalty and her optimistic worldview; and
 WHEREAS, Although Carol Sullivan is deeply missed, all those
 who held her dear will forever remember the joy, laughter, and love
 that she brought into their lives; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Caroline Virginia
 Ellwood Sullivan and extend heartfelt sympathy to her family and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Carol
 Sullivan.
 Morales of Maverick
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 821 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House