Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1019 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/14/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1019
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement for the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board to report certain student loan data.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.07764 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.07764.  ANNUAL REPORT REGARDING STUDENT LOAN DATA.
 (a) The coordinating board shall include in its annual report on
 financial aid in this state a breakdown of student loan data
 disaggregated by race, ethnicity, sex, degree type, and enrollment
 status, including whether the student has graduated.
 (b)  For the data reported under Subsection (a), the
 coordinating board shall provide an explanation of any limitation
 on the scope and accuracy of the data.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *