Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1065 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    By: Alvarado, et al. S.B. No. 1065
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 26, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1065 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to coverage for diagnostic imaging for breast cancer under
 certain health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 1356, Insurance Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1356. MAMMOGRAPHY AND OTHER BREAST IMAGING
 SECTION 2.  Section 1356.001(1-a), Insurance Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Diagnostic imaging [mammogram]" means an
 imaging examination using mammography, ultrasound imaging, or
 magnetic resonance imaging that is designed to evaluate:
 (A)  a subjective or objective abnormality
 detected by a physician or patient in a breast;
 (B)  an abnormality seen by a physician on a
 screening mammogram;
 (C)  an abnormality previously identified by a
 physician as probably benign in a breast for which follow-up
 imaging is recommended by a physician; or
 (D)  an individual with a personal history of
 breast cancer or dense breast tissue.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1356.005(a-1), Insurance Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A health benefit plan that provides coverage for a
 screening mammogram must provide coverage for [a] diagnostic
 imaging [mammogram] that is no less favorable than the coverage for
 a screening mammogram.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2022.  A health benefit plan that is
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2022,
 is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *