Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1071 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 1071


 AN ACT
 relating to disability retirement benefits for certain peace
 officers under the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 814.207(e), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  If a retiring member or retiree under this section
 presents evidence satisfactory to the retirement system that the
 person's occupational disability makes the person incapable of
 substantial gainful activity solely because of the disability and
 is considered a total disability under federal social security law,
 the retirement system shall, notwithstanding Section 811.006,
 increase the person's occupational disability retirement annuity
 to a monthly amount computed based on the maximum salary authorized
 under the position classification salary schedule prescribed by the
 General Appropriations Act, as adjusted from time to time,
 applicable to the position from which the person retired [100
 percent of the officer's average monthly compensation].
 SECTION 2.  (a) Subject to Subsection (b) of this section,
 the Employees Retirement System of Texas shall recompute an annuity
 that first became payable before September 1, 2021, as though
 Section 814.207(e), Government Code, as amended by this Act, was in
 effect on the date the increased annuity first became payable.
 (b)  The first payment of an annuity recomputed under
 Subsection (a) of this section is payable on the first payment date
 occurring on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1071 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1071 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 118,
 Nays 29, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor