Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1089 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1089
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 26, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 3; April 26, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the maximum reference base amount for
 certain consumer loans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 342.251, Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 342.251.  MAXIMUM CASH ADVANCE. The maximum cash
 advance of a loan made under this subchapter is an amount computed
 under Subchapter C, Chapter 341, using the reference base amount of
 $100, except that for loans that are subject to Section 342.259 the
 reference base amount is $300 [$200].
 SECTION 2.  Section 342.259(a), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Instead of the charges authorized by Sections 342.201
 and 342.252, a loan made under this subchapter with a maximum cash
 advance computed under Subchapter C, Chapter 341, using a reference
 base amount that is more than $100 but not more than $300 [$200],
 may provide for:
 (1)  an acquisition charge that is not more than $10;
 and
 (2)  an installment account handling charge that is not
 more than the ratio of $4 a month for each $100 of cash advance.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a loan made on or after the effective date of this Act.  A loan made
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the loan was made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *