Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1114 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                    By: Bettencourt, et al. S.B. No. 1114
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 1, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; April 6, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1114 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to verification of the citizenship status of certain
 registered voters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.0332, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  After the registrar receives notification [a list]
 under Section 18.068 of this code or Section 62.113, Government
 Code, of persons excused or disqualified from jury service because
 of citizenship status or notification of persons who have indicated
 a lack of citizenship status in connection with a motor vehicle or
 Department of Public Safety record, the registrar shall deliver to
 each registered voter whose name appears on the list a written
 notice requiring the voter to submit to the registrar proof of
 United States citizenship in the form of a certified copy of the
 voter's birth certificate, United States passport, or certificate
 of naturalization or any other form prescribed by the secretary of
 state.  The notice shall be delivered by forwardable mail to the
 mailing address on the voter's registration application and to any
 new address of the voter known to the registrar.
 (d)  The secretary of state shall prescribe rules for the
 administration of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *