Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1129 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1129
 (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 12, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 12, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1129 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to guardianships, alternatives to guardianship, and
 supports and services for incapacitated persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1023.005, Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1023.005.  COURT ACTION. (a) On hearing an application
 or motion under Section 1023.003, if [good cause is not shown to
 deny the transfer and] it appears that transfer of the guardianship
 is in the best interests of the ward and either the ward has resided
 in the county to which the guardianship is to be transferred for at
 least six months or good cause is not otherwise shown to deny the
 transfer, the court shall enter an order:
 (1)  authorizing the transfer on payment on behalf of
 the estate of all accrued costs; [and]
 (2)  requiring that any existing bond of the guardian
 must remain in effect until a new bond has been given or a rider has
 been filed in accordance with Section 1023.010; and
 (3)  certifying that the guardianship is in compliance
 with this code at the time of transfer.
 (b)  In making a determination that the transfer is in the
 best interests of the ward under Subsection (a), the court may
 consider:
 (1)  the interests of justice;
 (2)  the convenience of the parties; and
 (3)  the preference of the ward, if the ward is 12 years
 of age or older.
 (c)  On receipt of an order described by Subsection (a), the
 county shall accept the transfer of the guardianship.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1023.008, Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1023.008.  CONTINUATION OF GUARDIANSHIP. (a) When a
 guardianship is transferred from one county to another in
 accordance with this chapter:
 (1)  [,] the guardianship proceeds in the court to
 which it was transferred as if it had been originally commenced in
 that court;
 (2)  the court to which the guardianship is transferred
 becomes the court of continuing, exclusive jurisdiction;
 (3)  a proceeding relating to the guardianship that is
 commenced in the court ordering the transfer continues in the court
 to which the guardianship is transferred as if the proceeding
 commenced in the receiving court;
 (4)  a judgment or order entered in the guardianship
 before the transfer has the same effect and must be enforced as a
 judgment or order entered by the court to which the guardianship is
 transferred; and
 (5)  the court ordering the transfer does not retain:
 (A)  jurisdiction of the ward who is the subject
 of the guardianship; and
 (B)  the authority to enforce an order entered for
 a violation of this title that occurred before or after the
 transfer.
 (b)  It is not necessary to record in the receiving court any
 of the papers in the case that were recorded in the court from which
 the case was transferred.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 1023, Estates Code, is amended by adding
 Section 1023.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1023.011.  NO LIABILITY OF JUDGE. (a) When a
 guardianship is transferred from one county to another in
 accordance with this chapter, a judge of the court from which the
 guardianship is transferred may not be held civilly liable for any
 injury, damage, or loss to the ward or the ward's estate that occurs
 after the transfer.
 (b)  A judge of the court to which a guardianship is
 transferred as described by Subsection (a) may not be held civilly
 liable for any injury, damage, or loss to the ward or the ward's
 estate that occurred before the transfer.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1055, Estates Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D.  MEDIATION
 Sec. 1055.151.  MEDIATION OF CONTESTED GUARDIANSHIP
 PROCEEDING. (a) Subject to Subsection (b), on [On] the written
 agreement of the parties or on the court's own motion, the court may
 refer a contested guardianship proceeding to mediation.
 (b)  If the court refers to mediation a proceeding under
 Subsection (a) regarding the appointment of a guardian for a
 proposed ward:
 (1)  a determination of incapacity of the proposed ward
 may be an issue to be mediated, but the applicant for guardianship
 must still prove to the court that the proposed ward is an
 incapacitated person in accordance with the requirements of Chapter
 1101; and
 (2)  all parties to the proceeding shall evaluate
 during the mediation alternatives to guardianship and supports and
 services available to the proposed ward, including whether the
 supports and services and alternatives to guardianship would be
 feasible to avoid the need for appointment of a guardian.
 (c)  The cost of mediation shall be paid by the parties to the
 proceeding unless otherwise ordered by the court. If the parties
 are unable to pay the cost of mediation, the court may refer the
 parties to a local alternative dispute resolution center providing
 services as part of a system for resolution of disputes established
 under Section 152.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, if a
 system has been established in the county, and the local center may
 waive mediation costs as appropriate.
 Sec. 1055.152.  MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS. (a)  A
 mediated settlement agreement is binding on the parties if the
 agreement:
 (1)  provides, in a prominently displayed statement
 that is in boldfaced type, in capital letters, or underlined, that
 the agreement is not subject to revocation by the parties;
 (2)  is signed by each party to the agreement; and
 (3)  is signed by the party's attorney, if any, who is
 present at the time the agreement is signed.
 (b) [(c)]  If a mediated settlement agreement meets the
 requirements of this section, a party is entitled to judgment on the
 mediated settlement agreement notwithstanding Rule 11, Texas Rules
 of Civil Procedure, or another rule or law.
 (c) [(d)]  Notwithstanding Subsections (a) and (b) [and
 (c)], a court may decline to enter a judgment on a mediated
 settlement agreement if the court finds that the agreement is not in
 the ward's or proposed ward's best interests.
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 155, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter G to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER G. GUARDIANSHIP MEDIATION TRAINING
 Sec. 155.301.  TRAINING. (a) The office by rule shall
 establish a training course with at least 24 hours of training for
 persons facilitating mediations under Title 3, Estates Code, that
 may be provided by a mediation training provider approved by the
 office. A mediation training provider shall adhere to the
 established curriculum in providing the training course.
 (b)  This section does not require a mediator facilitating a
 mediation under Title 3, Estates Code, to attend or be certified
 under a training course established under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 guardianship created before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 7.  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas
 Judicial System is required to implement a provision of this Act
 only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose.  If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the Office of Court Administration
 of the Texas Judicial System may, but is not required to, implement
 a provision of this Act using other appropriations available for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *