Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1156 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2021

                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1156
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; March 30, 2021,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 15, Nays 0;
 March 30, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the contracting authority of the Health and Human
 Services Commission for the volunteer advocate for children
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 264.603(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall contract with one statewide
 organization that is exempt from federal income taxation under
 Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization
 described by Section 501(c)(3) of that code [and designated as a
 supporting organization under Section 509(a)(3) of that code,] and
 that is composed of individuals or groups of individuals who have
 expertise in the dynamics of child abuse and neglect and experience
 in operating volunteer advocate programs to provide training,
 technical assistance, and evaluation services for the benefit of
 local volunteer advocate programs. The contract shall:
 (1)  include measurable goals and objectives relating
 to the number of:
 (A)  volunteer advocates in the program; and
 (B)  children receiving services from the
 program; and
 (2)  follow practices designed to ensure compliance
 with standards referenced in the contract.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *