Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1178 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1178
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; April 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1178 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the rights and duties of parents and the protection of
 parental rights in suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.001(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the rights and duties described by
 Section 151.004, a [A] parent of a child has the following rights
 and duties:
 (1)  the right to have physical possession[, to direct
 the moral and religious training,] and to designate the residence
 of the child;
 (2)  the duty of care, control, protection, and
 reasonable discipline of the child;
 (3)  the duty to support the child, including providing
 the child with clothing, food, shelter, medical and dental care,
 and education;
 (4)  the duty, except when a guardian of the child's
 estate has been appointed, to manage the estate of the child,
 including the right as an agent of the child to act in relation to
 the child's estate if the child's action is required by a state, the
 United States, or a foreign government;
 (5)  except as provided by Section 264.0111, the right
 to the services and earnings of the child;
 (6)  the right to consent to the child's marriage,
 enlistment in the armed forces of the United States, medical and
 dental care, and psychiatric, psychological, and surgical
 treatment;
 (7)  the right to represent the child in legal action
 and to make other decisions of substantial legal significance
 concerning the child;
 (8)  the right to receive and give receipt for payments
 for the support of the child and to hold or disburse funds for the
 benefit of the child;
 (9)  the right to inherit from and through the child;
 and
 (10)  [the right to make decisions concerning the
 child's education; and
 [(11)]  any other right or duty existing between a
 parent and child by virtue of law.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 151, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Section 151.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.004.  PRESUMPTION OF PARENTAL FITNESS; FUNDAMENTAL
 RIGHT OF PARENTS TO RAISE CHILDREN. (a)  In a suit, there is a
 presumption that a parent is a fit parent who acts in the best
 interest of the parent's child.
 (b)  The fundamental right of a parent to raise the parent's
 child includes the right to direct and make decisions for the
 child's care, custody, control, education, upbringing, moral and
 religious training, and medical care.
 (c)  In a suit between a parent and a nonparent, a court may
 not grant any relief that conflicts with a parent's decisions or
 proposed decisions for the child unless the court finds that:
 (1)  the requested relief is necessary to prevent a
 significant impairment of the child's physical health or emotional
 well-being; or
 (2)  in the most recent final order rendered regarding
 the child in a previous suit to which the parent was a party, the
 parent:
 (A)  either:
 (i)  was given an opportunity to be heard and
 present evidence; or
 (ii)  entered into a written agreement that
 did not name the parent as the sole managing conservator or a joint
 managing conservator of the child;
 (B)  was not appointed as the sole managing
 conservator or a joint managing conservator of the child; and
 (C)  had adequate notice of the final hearing as
 required by law.
 (d)  This section may not be construed to limit the rights of
 the state to investigate or act on a report of child abuse or
 neglect allegedly committed by a person responsible for a child's
 care, custody, or welfare, beyond the limitations required by the
 United States Constitution and the Texas Constitution.
 (e)  This section does not apply to an order to enforce child
 support.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *