Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1179 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1179
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 1, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure for donating juror reimbursements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 61.003(a) and (e), Government Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  After jury service is concluded, each [Each] person who
 reported [reports] for jury service shall be personally provided a
 form letter that when signed by the person directs the county
 treasurer to donate all, or a specific amount designated by the
 person, of the person's daily reimbursement under this chapter to:
 (1)  the compensation to victims of crime fund
 established under Subchapter J, Chapter 56B, Code of Criminal
 Procedure;
 (2)  the child welfare, child protective services, or
 child services board of the county appointed under Section 264.005,
 Family Code, that serves abused and neglected children;
 (3)  any program selected by the commissioners court
 that is operated by a public or private nonprofit organization and
 that provides shelter and services to victims of family violence;
 (4)  any other program approved by the commissioners
 court of the county, including a program established under Article
 56A.205, Code of Criminal Procedure, that offers psychological
 counseling in criminal cases involving graphic evidence or
 testimony; or
 (5)  a veterans treatment court program established by
 the commissioners court as provided by Chapter 124.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a county that has
 adopted a system or method of payment authorized by Section
 113.048, Local Government Code, may provide a person who reported
 [reports] for jury service in the county an opportunity to donate
 all, or a specific part designated by the juror, of the juror's
 daily reimbursement by completing a self-executing application on a
 form prescribed by the commissioners court that is provided after
 jury service is concluded.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a person summoned to
 appear for jury service who is required to appear on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A person summoned to appear for jury
 service who is required to appear before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *