Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1185 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2021

                    By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1185
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 3 in
 Harris County as the Vanessa Guillen Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.190 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.190.  VANESSA GUILLEN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a) The
 portion of State Highway 3 in Harris County between its
 intersection with Interstate Highway 45 and its intersection with
 Almeda Genoa Road is designated as the Vanessa Guillen Memorial
 Highway. The designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Vanessa Guillen Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *