By: Seliger S.B. No. 1212 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government; April 8, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Booker Hospital District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1003.051, Special District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 1003.051. BOARD. The district is governed by a board of five [seven] directors. SECTION 2. Section 1003.052(a), Special District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Unless a four-year term is established under Section 285.081, Health and Safety Code: (1) directors serve staggered terms of two years; (2) two [three] directors shall be elected in odd-numbered years and three [four] directors shall be elected in even-numbered years; and (3) a directors election shall be held on the first Saturday in May of each year to elect the appropriate number of directors. SECTION 3. (a) At the election for directors of the Booker Hospital District to be held on May 7, 2022, five directors shall be elected. The three directors who receive the three highest number of total votes cast at the election shall serve two-year terms and the two directors who receive the fourth and fifth highest number of total votes cast at the election shall serve one-year terms. (b) Notwithstanding Section 1003.051, Special District Local Laws Code, as amended by this Act, the seven directors serving on the board of directors immediately before the effective date of this Act continue to serve as the district's governing body until a majority of the directors elected on May 7, 2022, take office, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. The terms of the directors serving on the board of directors immediately before the effective date of this Act expire on the date a majority of the directors elected on May 7, 2022, take office. (c) Service on the board of directors of the district before May 7, 2022, does not make a person ineligible for election as a director of the district at the election held on May 7, 2022, or at a subsequent election of district directors. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *