Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1225 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 1225
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 23, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a governmental body impacted by a
 catastrophe to temporarily suspend the requirements of the public
 information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.233, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 462 (S.B. 494), Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2019, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Catastrophe" means a condition or occurrence that
 directly interferes with the ability of a governmental body to
 comply with the requirements of this chapter, including:
 (A)  fire, flood, earthquake, hurricane, tornado,
 or wind, rain, or snow storm;
 (B)  power failure, transportation failure, or
 interruption of communication facilities;
 (C)  epidemic; or
 (D)  riot, civil disturbance, enemy attack, or
 other actual or threatened act of lawlessness or violence.
 (2)  "Catastrophe" does not mean a period when staff is
 required to work remotely and can access information responsive to
 an application for information electronically, but the physical
 office of the governmental body is closed.
 (3)  "Suspension period" means the period of time
 during which a governmental body may suspend the applicability of
 the requirements of this chapter to the governmental body under
 this section.
 (b)  The requirements of this chapter do not apply to a
 governmental body during the suspension period determined by the
 governmental body under Subsections (d) and (e) if the governmental
 body:
 (1)  is currently significantly impacted by a
 catastrophe such that the catastrophe directly causes the inability
 of a governmental body to comply with the requirements of this
 chapter; and
 (2)  complies with the requirements of this section.
 (d)  A governmental body may suspend the applicability of the
 requirements of this chapter to the governmental body for an
 initial suspension period. The governmental body may suspend the
 applicability of the requirements of this chapter under this
 subsection only once for each catastrophe. The initial suspension
 period may not exceed seven consecutive days and must occur during
 the period that:
 (1)  begins not earlier than the second day before the
 date the governmental body submits notice to the office of the
 attorney general under Subsection (c); and
 (2)  ends not later than the seventh day after the date
 the governmental body submits that notice.
 (e)  A governmental body may extend an initial suspension
 period if the governing body determines that the governing body is
 still impacted by the catastrophe on which the initial suspension
 period was based. The initial suspension period may be extended one
 time for not more than seven consecutive days that begin on the day
 following the day the initial suspension period ends. The
 governing body must submit notice of the extension to the office of
 the attorney general on the form prescribed by the office under
 Subsection (l)[(j)].
 (f)  A governmental body that initiates a suspension period
 under Subsection (d) may not initiate another suspension period
 related to the same catastrophe, except for a single extension
 period as prescribed in Subsection (e).
 (g)  The combined suspension period for a governmental body
 filing under Subsections (d) and (e) may not exceed a total of 14
 consecutive calendar days with respect to any single catastrophe.
 (h)  A governmental body that suspends the applicability of
 the requirements of this chapter to the governmental body under
 this section must provide notice to the public of the suspension in
 a place readily accessible to the public and in each other location
 the governmental body is required to post a notice under Subchapter
 C, Chapter 551. The governmental body must maintain the notice of
 the suspension during the suspension period.
 (i)[(g)]  Notwithstanding another provision of this chapter,
 a request for public information received by a governmental body
 during a suspension period determined by the governmental body is
 considered to have been received by the governmental body on the
 first business day after the date the suspension period ends.
 (j)[(h)]  The requirements of this chapter related to a
 request for public information received by a governmental body
 before the date an initial suspension period determined by the
 governmental body begins are tolled until the first business day
 after the date the suspension period ends.
 (k)[(i)]  The office of the attorney general shall
 continuously post on the Internet website of the office each notice
 submitted to the office under this section from the date the office
 receives the notice until the first anniversary of that date.
 (l)[(j)]  The office of the attorney general shall prescribe
 the form of the notice that a governmental body must submit to the
 office under Subsections (c) and (e). The notice must require the
 governmental body to:
 (1)  identify and describe the catastrophe that the
 governmental body is currently impacted by;
 (2)  state the date the initial suspension period
 determined by the governmental body under Subsection (d) begins and
 the date that period ends;
 (3)  if the governmental body has determined to extend
 the initial suspension period under Subsection (e):
 (A)  state that the governmental body continues to
 be impacted by the catastrophe identified in Subdivision (1); and
 (B)  state the date the extension to the initial
 suspension period begins and the date the period ends; and
 (4)  provide any other information the office of the
 attorney general determines necessary.
 (m)  Upon conclusion of any suspension period initiated
 pursuant to Subsections (d) or (e), the governmental body shall
 immediately resume compliance with all requirements of this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 552.2211 is added to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.2211.  PRODUCTION OF PUBLIC INFORMATION WHEN
 ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICES CLOSED. (a) Except as provided by Section
 552.233, if a governmental body closes its physical offices, but
 requires staff to work, including remotely, then the governmental
 body shall make a good faith effort to continue responding to
 applications for public information, to the extent staff have
 access to public information responsive to an application, pursuant
 to this chapter while its administrative offices are closed.
 (b)  Failure to respond to requests in accordance with
 Subsection (a) may constitute a refusal to request an attorney
 general's decision as provided by Subchapter G or a refusal to
 supply public information or information that the attorney general
 has determined is public information that is not excepted from
 disclosure under Subchapter C as described by Subsection
 552.321(a).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *