Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1253 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2021

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 1253
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance and renewal of licenses to carry a handgun
 for purposes of reciprocity with other states.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.177, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e) For the purpose of reciprocity with other states, the
 department shall issue a license under this subchapter to each
 applicant who meets all the eligibility requirements and submits
 all the application materials, regardless of whether the applicant
 may legally carry a handgun without a license in this state under
 Chapter 46, Penal Code, or other state law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 411.185, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  For the purpose of reciprocity with other states, the
 department shall renew the license of each license holder who meets
 all the eligibility requirements to continue to hold a license and
 who submits all the renewal materials described by Subsection (a),
 regardless of whether the license holder may legally carry a
 handgun without a license in this state under Chapter 46, Penal
 Code, or other state law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *