Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1264 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 1264
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 21, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the Texas Fair Housing Act to
 certain sales and rentals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 301.041, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 301.041.  CERTAIN SALES AND RENTALS EXEMPTED. (a)
 Sections 301.021, 301.023, 301.024, and 301.025 do [Subchapter B
 does] not apply to:
 (1)  the sale or rental of a single-family house sold or
 rented by the owner if:
 (A)  the owner does not:
 (i)  own more than three single-family
 houses at any one time; or
 (ii)  own any interest in, nor is there owned
 or reserved on the person's behalf, under any express or voluntary
 agreement, title to or any right to any part of the proceeds from
 the sale or rental of more than three single-family houses at any
 one time; and
 (B)  the house is sold or rented without:
 (i)  the use of the sales or rental
 facilities or services of a broker, agent, or salesperson licensed
 under Chapter 1101, Occupations Code, or of an employee or agent of
 a licensed broker, agent, or salesperson, or the facilities or
 services of any person in the business of selling or renting a
 dwelling [the owner of a dwelling designed or intended for
 occupancy by five or more families]; or
 (ii)  the publication, posting, or mailing
 of a notice, statement, or advertisement prohibited by Section
 301.022; or
 (2)  the sale or rental of the rooms or units in a
 dwelling containing living quarters occupied by or intended to be
 occupied by not more than four families living independently of
 each other, if the owner maintains and occupies one of the living
 quarters as the owner's residence.
 (b)  The exemption in Subsection (a)(1) applies only to one
 sale [or rental] in a 24-month period if the owner was not the most
 recent resident of the house at the time of the sale [or rental].
 (c)  Subsection (a) does not prohibit the use of attorneys,
 escrow agents, abstractors, title companies, and other
 professional assistants necessary to transfer title.
 (d)  For purposes of Subsection (a), a person is in the
 business of selling or renting a dwelling if:
 (1)  the person has, within the preceding year,
 participated as the seller or landlord in three or more
 transactions involving the sale or rental of a dwelling or any
 interest in a dwelling;
 (2)  the person has, within the preceding year,
 participated in two or more transactions, other than transactions
 involving the person's own dwelling, as an agent providing sales or
 rental facilities or services involving the sale or rental of a
 dwelling or any interest in a dwelling; or
 (3)  the person is the owner of a dwelling designed or
 intended for occupancy by, or that is occupied by, five or more
 families.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *