Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1270 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 1270
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 26, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas  9, Nays 0; April 26, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1270 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procurement of certain goods and services related
 to highways by the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 223.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e)
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) and Section
 223.042(c), the [The] department shall submit for competitive bids
 each contract for:
 (1)  the improvement of a highway;
 (2)  materials to be used in the construction or
 maintenance of a highway; or
 (3)  traffic control or safety devices to be used on a
 highway.
 (c)  The department may award a contract described by
 Subsection (b)(2) or (3) as a purchase of goods under Subtitle D,
 Title 10, Government Code, except as provided by Subsection (d), if
 the department:
 (1)  estimates that the contract will be within an
 amount for which purchasing authority has been delegated to state
 agencies under statute or rules adopted by the comptroller; and
 (2)  determines that the competitive bidding procedure
 in this chapter is not practical.
 (d)  An award under Subsection (c) for a contract described
 by Subsection (b)(2) must be made to the lowest responsive bidder.
 (e)  After the award of a contract described by Subsection
 (c), the department shall post on the department's Internet website
 the bid tabulation for that contract.
 SECTION 2.  Section 223.042, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  The department may award a contract under this section
 as a purchase of service under Subtitle D, Title 10, Government
 Code, if the department:
 (1)  estimates that the contract will be within
 [involve] an amount for which [a formal solicitation process for
 the purchase of services is not required under rules relating to the
 delegation of] purchasing authority has been delegated to state
 agencies under statute or rules adopted by the comptroller [under
 Subchapter C, Chapter 2155, Government Code]; and
 (2)  determines that the competitive bidding procedure
 in this chapter is not practical.
 (c-1)  After the award of a contract described by Subsection
 (c), the department shall post on the department's Internet website
 the bid tabulation for that contract.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract for which the Texas Department of Transportation
 first advertises or otherwise solicits bids, proposals, offers, or
 qualifications or makes a similar solicitation on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A contract for which the Texas
 Department of Transportation first advertises or otherwise
 solicits bids, proposals, offers, or qualifications or makes a
 similar solicitation before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the advertisement or
 solicitation is made, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *