Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1280 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2021

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 1280
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 31, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain provisions of The Securities Act for which a
 person offering or selling a security may be held liable to a person
 buying the security.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4008.051(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who offers or sells a security in violation of
 the following is liable to a person who buys the security from the
 offeror or seller:
 (1)  Section 4003.001(a), [4003.002, 4003.003, or
 4003.004; Subchapter B, Chapter 4003, other than Section
 4003.054(b)(1); Subchapter C, Chapter 4003, other than Section
 4003.103(b); Section 4004.001,] 4004.051, 4004.052, 4004.101(a),
 [or] 4004.102(a), [;] or [Section] 4007.103;
 (2)  Subchapter G, Chapter 4003, other than Section
 4003.304, or a requirement of the commissioner under Subchapter G,
 Chapter 4003, other than Section 4003.304; or
 (3)  an order under Section 4007.101 or 4007.104.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *