87R11115 CXP-D By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1331 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to electric energy storage in the ERCOT power region. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is amended by adding Section 39.159 to read as follows: Sec. 39.159. ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE IN ERCOT POWER REGION. Not later than June 1 of each year, the independent organization certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region shall: (1) determine the 24-hour period of peak demand in the power region from the previous calendar year; and (2) take measures to encourage the addition of electric energy storage in the power region as necessary to ensure that the amount of storage available can provide: (A) by December 31, 2022, at least 2 percent of the amount determined under Subdivision (1); (B) by December 31, 2023, at least 4 percent of the amount determined under Subdivision (1); (C) by December 31, 2024, at least 6 percent of the amount determined under Subdivision (1); (D) by December 31, 2025, at least 8 percent of the amount determined under Subdivision (1); and (E) by December 31, 2026, and December 31 of each subsequent year, at least 10 percent of the amount determined under Subdivision (1). SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.