Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1334 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2021

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1334
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 15, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1334 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the lease, rental, and donation to the United States of
 certain facilities relating to a toll bridge by certain counties
 and municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 364, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 364.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 364.005.  LEASE, RENTAL, OR DONATION OF FACILITY TO
 UNITED STATES. (a) A county may lease, rent, or donate to the
 United States property or a building, structure, or other facility
 acquired, constructed, improved, enlarged, or equipped in whole or
 in part with proceeds from the sale of bonds issued by a county
 under this chapter.
 (b)  The acquisition, construction, improvement,
 enlargement, or equipment by a county of property or a building,
 structure, or other facility for lease to and the donation of
 property or a building, structure, or other facility by a county to
 the United States for use in performing a federal governmental
 function in the county or at or near and relating to a toll bridge of
 the county is a public purpose and proper county function,
 regardless of whether the toll bridge or the federal facility
 relating to the toll bridge is located inside or outside the county.
 SECTION 2.  Section 364.043(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A county, through the commissioners court, may issue,
 sell, and deliver negotiable bonds to accomplish the purposes of
 this chapter. The county may use the bonds or the proceeds of the
 sale of the bonds to acquire, construct, improve, enlarge, or equip
 in whole or in part a toll bridge or a related building, structure,
 or other facility under this chapter or may exchange the bonds for
 property to accomplish the purposes of this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  Section 367.012, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 367.012.  PUBLIC PURPOSE. The acquisition,
 construction, improvement, enlargement, or equipment by a
 municipality of property or a building, structure, or other
 facility for lease to and the donation of property or a building,
 structure, or other facility by a municipality to the United States
 for use in performing a federal governmental function in the
 municipality or at or near and relating to a toll bridge of the
 municipality is a public purpose and a proper municipal function,
 regardless of whether the toll bridge or the federal facility
 relating to the toll bridge is located inside or outside the
 municipality.
 SECTION 4.  Section 367.013, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 367.013.  LEASE, [OR] RENTAL, OR DONATION OF FACILITY
 TO UNITED STATES. A municipality may lease, [or] rent, or donate to
 the United States property or a building, structure, or other
 facility acquired, constructed, improved, enlarged, or equipped in
 whole or in part with proceeds from the sale of bonds issued under
 this subchapter.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a bond issued on or after the effective date of this Act. A bond
 issued before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 applicable law in effect before the effective date of this Act, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *