Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1338 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/11/2021

                    S.B. No. 1338


 AN ACT
 relating to disclosure requirements for agreements consenting to
 municipal annexation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.004.  REQUIRED DISCLOSURE BEFORE ANNEXATION
 AGREEMENT. (a) At the time a municipality makes an offer to a
 landowner to enter into an agreement in which the landowner
 consents to annexation, the municipality must provide the landowner
 with the written disclosure described by Section 212.172(b-1).
 (b)  An annexation agreement for which a disclosure is not
 provided in accordance with Subsection (a) is void.
 SECTION 2.  Section 212.172, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  At the time a municipality makes an offer to a
 landowner to enter into an agreement under this subchapter, the
 municipality must provide the landowner with a written disclosure
 that includes:
 (1)  a statement that the landowner is not required to
 enter into the agreement;
 (2)  the authority under which the municipality may
 annex the land with references to relevant law;
 (3)  a plain-language description of the annexation
 procedures applicable to the land;
 (4)  whether the procedures require the landowner's
 consent; and
 (5)  a statement regarding the municipality's waiver of
 immunity to suit.
 (b-2)  An agreement for which a disclosure is not provided in
 accordance with Subsection (b-1) is void.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1338 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 11, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1338 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 4, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor