Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1349 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    By: Eckhardt S.B. No. 1349
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 20, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1349 By:  Miles


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to placing a child in the possessory conservatorship of
 the child's parents in certain situations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 263, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 263.409 to read as follows:
 Sec. 263.409.  MODIFICATION OF FINAL ORDER. (a) A parent
 may file suit to modify a final order rendered under this subchapter
 if the final order:
 (1)  appoints as the child's managing conservator a
 person who is not the child's parent, other than the department;
 (2)  did not terminate the rights of the parent of the
 child; and
 (3)  appoints the parent as a possessory conservator of
 the child.
 (b)  A parent may not file a suit to modify a final order as
 authorized by this section before the second anniversary of the
 date the court rendered the final order.
 (c)  In a suit to modify a final order authorized by this
 section, the court may order the return of the child to the child's
 parent if the court finds it is in the best interest of the child.
 SECTION 2.  Section 263.501(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If the department is appointed [has been named] as a
 child's managing conservator in a final order that does not include
 termination of parental rights, or if the department is not
 dismissed from the suit in a final order that appoints a person who
 is not the child's parent as the child's managing conservator and
 that does not include termination of parental rights, the court
 shall conduct a permanency hearing after the final order is
 rendered at least once every six months until the department:
 (1)  is no longer the child's managing conservator; or
 (2)  is dismissed from the suit.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 263, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 263.504 to read as follows:
 Sec. 263.504.  RETURNING CHILD TO PARENT. (a) At each
 permanency hearing after the second anniversary of the date the
 court rendered the final order appointing the department as the
 child's managing conservator without terminating parental rights,
 the department shall review the child's placement to determine
 whether the child could be returned to the child's parent if the
 parent was named possessory conservator for the child in the final
 order.
 (b)  At each permanency hearing after the second anniversary
 of the date the court rendered the final order appointing a person
 who is not the child's parent as the child's managing conservator
 without terminating parental rights or dismissing the department
 from the suit, the department shall review the child's placement to
 determine whether the child could be returned to the child's parent
 if the parent was named possessory conservator for the child in the
 final order.
 (c)  The department may recommend reunification with the
 child's parent if the department finds:
 (1)  the parent of the child has remedied the condition
 or conditions that led to removal of the child;
 (2)  the parent of the child is willing and able to care
 for the child;
 (3)  the best interest of the child will be served by
 placing the child with the child's parent; and
 (4)  the child's preference is to reside with the
 child's parent.
 (d)  The court may return the child to the child's parent if
 the court finds it is in the best interest of the child.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 permanency hearing held on or after the effective date of this Act
 regardless of the date on which the Department of Family and
 Protective Services is named the child's managing conservator.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *