Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1356 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 1356


 AN ACT
 relating to the participation by members of nonprofit teacher
 organizations in a tutoring program for public school students and
 related retirement benefits for certain tutors participating in the
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.092(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The agency shall provide [private schools and public
 schools] equivalent access to the registry maintained under this
 section to:
 (1)  private schools;
 (2)  public schools; and
 (3)  nonprofit teacher organizations approved by the
 commissioner for the purpose of participating in the tutoring
 program established under Section 33.913.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.913 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.913.  TUTORING PROGRAM. (a) A member of a nonprofit
 teacher organization or a person who is not a member but meets the
 requirements under Subsection (b) may participate in a tutoring
 program in accordance with this section to provide supplemental
 instruction to students in kindergarten through grade 12 on an
 individualized or small-group basis.
 (b)  To participate in the program as a tutor, a person must:
 (1)  be an active or retired teacher;
 (2)  apply for the position in a manner specified by the
 nonprofit organization;
 (3)  designate in the application whether the person
 plans to provide tutoring:
 (A)  for compensation, on a volunteer basis, or
 both; and
 (B)  in person, online, or both; and
 (4)  not be included in the registry of persons not
 eligible for employment by a public school under Section 22.092.
 (c)  The superintendent or chief executive officer of each
 school district or open-enrollment charter school or the person
 designated by the superintendent or chief executive officer shall:
 (1)  oversee the tutoring program within the district
 or school; and
 (2)  not later than the last day of each semester,
 submit a report to the board of trustees of the district or the
 governing body of the school that includes, with respect to that
 semester:
 (A)  the number of active or retired teachers who
 contacted the district or school to offer tutoring services to
 students in the district or school; and
 (B)  the number of active or retired teachers who
 were used by the district or school as a tutor on a volunteer basis
 or employed by the district or school to provide tutoring services
 for compensation.
 (d)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 use any available local, state, or federal funds to provide
 compensation to a person participating in the program as a tutor who
 is providing tutoring for compensation under the program.
 (e)  If an active or retired teacher who has been approved
 for participation in the tutoring program contacts a school
 district or open-enrollment charter school to provide tutoring to
 students in the district or school and the district or school needs
 tutoring assistance, the district or school may:
 (1)  if the teacher is providing tutoring services on a
 volunteer basis, use the volunteer tutoring services provided by
 the teacher; or
 (2)  if the district or school has local, state, or
 federal funds for purposes of the tutoring program and the teacher
 is providing tutoring services for compensation, employ the teacher
 as a tutor.
 (f)  At least quarterly, each nonprofit organization
 participating in the tutoring program shall provide to the
 organization's members:
 (1)  a description of the tutoring program and guidance
 on how to participate in the program; and
 (2)  the contact information of each person described
 by Subsection (c) for the school district in which the member
 resides, any open-enrollment charter schools located within that
 district, and any adjacent districts.
 (g)  This section does not create a cause of action or
 liability or an obligation or duty that provides a basis for a cause
 of action or liability against a nonprofit teacher organization
 approved by the commissioner for the purpose of participating in
 the tutoring program for any action taken by a member of the
 organization participating in the program as a tutor.
 SECTION 3.  Section 824.602(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Section 825.506, the retirement system may
 not, under Section 824.601, withhold a monthly benefit payment if
 the retiree is employed in a Texas public educational institution:
 (1)  as a substitute only with pay not more than the
 daily rate of substitute pay established by the employer and, if the
 retiree is a disability retiree, the employment has not exceeded a
 total of 90 days in the school year;
 (2)  in a position, other than as a substitute, on no
 more than a one-half time basis for the month;
 (3)  in one or more positions on as much as a full-time
 basis, if the retiree has been separated from service with all Texas
 public educational institutions for at least 12 full consecutive
 months after the retiree's effective date of retirement; [or]
 (4)  in a position, other than as a substitute, on no
 more than a one-half time basis for no more than 90 days in the
 school year, if the retiree is a disability retiree; or
 (5)  as a tutor under Section 33.913, Education Code.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter G, Chapter 825, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 825.604 to read as follows:
 Sec. 825.604.  INFORMATION PROVIDED TO MEMBERS. The
 retirement system shall regularly provide information in an
 electronic format to members and retirees regarding the tutoring
 program established under Section 33.913, Education Code, that
 includes:
 (1)  general information regarding the tutoring
 program; and
 (2)  a statement directing members and retirees who
 want to participate in the tutoring program to contact their local
 school districts or open-enrollment charter schools for further
 guidance.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Subject to Subsection (b) of this section,
 the changes in law made by this Act apply to a retiree of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas regardless of whether the person retired
 from employment before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  Section 824.602(a), Government Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to the employment of a retiree of the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas that occurs on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1356 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1356 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 1, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor