Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1372 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2021

                    By: Huffman, Schwertner S.B. No. 1372
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 9, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 15, Nays 0; April 9, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1372 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the evaluation and reporting of investment practices
 and performance of certain public retirement systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 802.109, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (d), (e), (f), and (h) and adding
 Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (e) and subject to
 Subsections (c) and (k), a public retirement system shall select an
 independent firm with substantial experience in evaluating
 institutional investment practices and performance to evaluate the
 appropriateness, adequacy, and effectiveness of the retirement
 system's investment practices and performance and to make
 recommendations for improving the retirement system's investment
 policies, procedures, and practices. Each evaluation must include:
 (1)  a summary of the independent firm's experience in
 evaluating institutional investment practices and performance and
 a statement that the firm's experience meets the experience
 required by this subsection;
 (2)  a statement indicating the nature of any existing
 relationship between the independent firm and the public retirement
 system and confirming that the firm and any related entity are not
 involved in directly or indirectly managing the investments of the
 system;
 (3)  a list of the types of remuneration received by the
 independent firm from sources other than the public retirement
 system for services provided to the system;
 (4)  a statement identifying any potential conflict of
 interest or any appearance of a conflict of interest that could
 impact the analysis included in the evaluation due to an existing
 relationship between the independent firm and:
 (A)  the public retirement system; or
 (B)  any current or former member of the governing
 body of the system; and
 (5)  an explanation of the firm's determination
 regarding whether to include a recommendation for each of the
 following evaluated matters:
 (A)  an analysis of any investment policy or
 strategic investment plan adopted by the retirement system and the
 retirement system's compliance with that policy or plan;
 (B) [(2)]  a detailed review of the retirement
 system's investment asset allocation, including:
 (i) [(A)]  the process for determining
 target allocations;
 (ii) [(B)]  the expected risk and expected
 rate of return, categorized by asset class;
 (iii) [(C)]  the appropriateness of
 selection and valuation methodologies of alternative and illiquid
 assets; and
 (iv) [(D)]  future cash flow and liquidity
 needs;
 (C) [(3)]  a review of the appropriateness of
 investment fees and commissions paid by the retirement system;
 (D) [(4)]  a review of the retirement system's
 governance processes related to investment activities, including
 investment decision-making processes, delegation of investment
 authority, and board investment expertise and education; and
 (E) [(5)]  a review of the retirement system's
 investment manager selection and monitoring process.
 (d)  A public retirement system shall conduct the evaluation
 described by Subsection (a):
 (1)  once every three years, if the total assets of the
 retirement system [has total assets the book value of which,] as of
 the last day of the preceding [last] fiscal year were [considered in
 an evaluation under this section, was] at least $100 million; or
 (2)  once every six years, if the total assets of the
 retirement system [has total assets the book value of which,] as of
 the last day of the preceding [last] fiscal year were [considered in
 an evaluation under this section, was] at least $30 million and less
 than $100 million.
 (e)  A public retirement system is not required to conduct
 the evaluation described by Subsection (a) if the total assets of
 the retirement system [has total assets the book value of which,] as
 of the last day of the preceding fiscal year were[, was] less than
 $30 million.
 (e-1)  Not later than the 30th day after the date an
 independent firm completes an evaluation described by Subsection
 (a), the independent firm shall:
 (1)  submit to the public retirement system for
 purposes of discussion and clarification a substantially completed
 preliminary draft of the evaluation report; and
 (2)  request in writing that the system, on or before
 the 30th day after the date the system receives the preliminary
 draft, submit to the firm:
 (A)  a description of any action taken or expected
 to be taken in response to a recommendation made in the evaluation;
 and
 (B)  any written response of the system that the
 system wants to accompany the final evaluation report.
 (f)  The independent firm shall file the final evaluation
 report, including the evaluation results and any response received
 from the public retirement system, [A report of an evaluation under
 this section must be filed] with the governing body of the [public
 retirement] system:
 (1)  not earlier than the 31st day after the date on
 which the preliminary draft is submitted to the system; and
 (2)  not later than the later of:
 (A)  the 60th day after the date on which the
 preliminary draft is submitted to the system; or
 (B)  May 1 in the [of each] year following the year
 in which the system is evaluated under Subsection (a) [(d)].
 (h)  A governmental entity that is the employer of active
 members of a public retirement system evaluated under Subsection
 (a) may pay all or part of the costs of the evaluation. The [A]
 public retirement system shall pay any remaining unpaid [the] costs
 of the [each] evaluation [of the system under this section].
 SECTION 2.  Section 802.109, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an evaluation commenced on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An evaluation commenced before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the evaluation was commenced, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *