Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1387 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1387
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 6, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1387 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a voting system used in an election
 in this state be manufactured, stored, and held in the United States
 by a company headquartered in the United States.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 122.032, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  For a voting system or voting system equipment to be
 approved for use in elections, the voting system in which the
 equipment is designed to be used must:
 (1)  comply with the standards prescribed by Subchapter
 A; and
 (2)  beginning September 1, 2021, be manufactured,
 stored, and held in the United States and sold by a company whose:
 (A)  headquarters are located in the United
 States; and
 (B)  parent company's headquarters, if
 applicable, are located in the United States.
 (a-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a), a voting system or
 voting system equipment is considered to be manufactured in the
 United States if the final assembly of the voting system or voting
 system equipment occurs in the United States.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *