Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1387 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2021

                    S.B. No. 1387


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a voting system used in an election
 in this state be manufactured, stored, and held in the United States
 by a company headquartered in the United States.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 122.032, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  For a voting system or voting system equipment to be
 approved for use in elections, the voting system in which the
 equipment is designed to be used must:
 (1)  comply with the standards prescribed by Subchapter
 A; and
 (2)  beginning September 1, 2021, be manufactured,
 stored, and held in the United States and sold by a company whose:
 (A)  headquarters are located in the United
 States; and
 (B)  parent company's headquarters, if
 applicable, are located in the United States.
 (a-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a), a voting system or
 voting system equipment is considered to be manufactured in the
 United States if:
 (1)  final assembly of the voting system or voting
 system equipment occurs in the United States; and
 (2)  all firmware and software are installed and tested
 in the United States.
 SECTION 2.  FEASIBILITY STUDY. (a)  The secretary of state
 shall conduct a comprehensive study to determine the feasibility of
 requiring each voting system used in an election in this state to
 have all components of the voting system, including all software
 and hardware, manufactured, stored, and held in the United States.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2023, the secretary shall
 create a detailed report summarizing the findings of the study and
 deliver the report to the legislature.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1387 passed the Senate on
 April 14, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1387 passed the House on
 May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 108, Nays 35, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor