Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1388 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1388
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 6, 2021, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1388 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the unlawful disclosure of an autopsy image or other
 visual depiction; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 42, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 42.076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.076.  UNLAWFUL DISCLOSURE OF AUTOPSY IMAGE OR OTHER
 VISUAL DEPICTION. (a) A person commits an offense if:
 (1)  the person discloses an image or other visual
 depiction of an autopsy without the prior consent of the person who
 is the subject of the autopsy or without the consent of that
 person's legal representative; and
 (2)  the disclosure of the image or other visual
 depiction reveals in any manner the identity of the person who is
 the subject of the autopsy, including through:
 (A)  any accompanying or subsequent information
 or material related to the visual depiction; or
 (B)  information or material provided by a third
 party in response to the disclosure of the visual depiction.
 (b)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under this
 section that:
 (1)  the disclosure is made in the course of:
 (A)  reporting unlawful activity; or
 (B)  a legal proceeding, if the disclosure is
 permitted or required by law; or
 (2)  the actor is an interactive computer service, as
 defined by 47 U.S.C. Section 230, and the disclosure consists of an
 image or visual depiction provided by another person to the
 computer service.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a misdemeanor
 punishable by:
 (1)  a fine of not more than $1,000;
 (2)  confinement in the county jail for not more than
 six months; or
 (3)  both the fine and confinement.
 (d)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under Section 552.352, Government Code,
 the actor may be prosecuted under either section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *