Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1397 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2021

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1397
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 8, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a coordinated system for the dispatch,
 triage, transport, and transfer of patients in certain trauma
 service area regional advisory councils; providing rulemaking
 authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 773.1141 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.1141. INFORMATION AND GUIDELINES RELATED TO CERTAIN
 PATIENT TRANSFERS AND RELATED SERVICES.  (a)  This section applies
 only to a trauma service area regional advisory council that
 includes:
 (1)  at least one county located on the international
 border of this state; and
 (2) at least one county adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico.
 (b) For each trauma service area regional advisory council to
 which this section applies, the department, by January 1, 2022, by
 rule shall:
 (1) require the council to create an advisory committee
 composed of equally represented designated trauma hospital members
 located within the geographic boundaries of the council to:
 (A) develop guidelines for patient transfers; and
 (B) periodically review patient transfers to
 ensure compliance with applicable guidelines;
 (2) for the purpose of ensuring that patients located
 in the council's geographic boundaries receive health care at the
 closest and most appropriate health care facility, require the
 council to implement a centralized system to assist the council in
 the dispatch, triage, transport, and transfer of patients; and
 (3) require each hospital and emergency services
 provider operating within the geographic boundaries of the council
 to collect and report to the council data on patients transferred
 outside the geographic boundaries of the council.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *