Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1418 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2021

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1418
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation of the presiding judge of an early
 ballot voting board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 87.005, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 87.005.  COMPENSATION OF MEMBERS. (a) Members of the
 early voting ballot board are entitled to the same compensation as
 presiding election judges, except that:
 (1)  the presiding judge may be compensated at a higher
 rate at the discretion of the appropriate authority; and
 (2)  if [as provided by Subsection (b).
 [(b)  If] the board concludes its work in less than 10 hours,
 the members may be paid greater compensation than that regularly
 payable for the amount of time worked, but not to exceed the amount
 payable for 10 hours' work.
 (b) [(c)]  Precinct officers serving as board members under
 Section 87.004 may not be compensated for both positions.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *