Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1439 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2021

                    By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1439
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1439 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to required written consent of a physician, intern, or
 resident of an educational institution before directly or
 indirectly performing or participating in an elective abortion.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 103, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Section 103.0015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 103.0015.  OPT IN REQUIRED. A physician, intern, or
 resident of an educational institution may not be scheduled for or
 assigned to duties involving directly or indirectly performing or
 participating in an elective abortion procedure unless the
 physician, intern, or resident first affirmatively consents in
 writing to performing or participating in the procedure.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *