Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1441 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    S.B. No. 1441


 AN ACT
 relating to withdrawals of water from the Edwards Aquifer to supply
 a military installation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 1.33, Chapter 626, Acts of
 the 73rd Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1.33.  WELL METERING AND PERMITTING EXEMPTIONS
 [EXEMPTION].
 SECTION 2.  Section 1.33, Chapter 626, Acts of the 73rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, is amended by adding
 Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows:
 (e)  In addition to permitted withdrawals from the aquifer, a
 municipally owned utility owned by the City of San Antonio, without
 a permit, may withdraw groundwater from the aquifer if:
 (1)  the utility uses the groundwater to supply a
 military installation with water for human consumption,
 irrigation, operations, mission support, or infrastructure
 maintenance;
 (2)  the utility and the military installation enter
 into a contract requiring the installation to reduce its
 groundwater withdrawals from the aquifer by the same amount of
 withdrawn water the installation receives from the utility; and
 (3)  the utility complies with rules adopted by the
 authority that allow the authority to monitor groundwater
 withdrawals from the aquifer by the utility and determine amounts
 of groundwater exempted from permitting in accordance with this
 subsection, including rules requiring the reporting of amounts
 supplied by the utility to the military installation and amounts by
 which the military installation reduces the installation's
 groundwater withdrawals from the aquifer.
 (f)  Subsection (e) of this section does not alter the
 obligations of a military installation under a biological opinion
 issued by a federal agency.
 (g)  The amount of water provided by a municipally owned
 utility to a military installation under Subsection (e) of this
 section may not exceed the maximum amount of water that the military
 installation is authorized to withdraw from the aquifer under a
 biological opinion issued by a federal agency.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1441 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1441 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor