Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1448 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2021

                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1448
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 9, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 9, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1448 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the windstorm insurance
 legislative oversight board and to certain studies by the board
 relating to the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and the Fair
 Access to Insurance Requirements Plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter N, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2210.655 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.655.  TEMPORARY POWERS AND DUTIES OF BOARD; STUDY
 OF FUNDING AND FUNDING STRUCTURE.  (a)  The board shall:
 (1)  gather information regarding:
 (A)  how the association's current funding and
 funding structure operate;
 (B)  how the catastrophic risk pools of other
 states operate; and
 (C)  other information that the board considers
 necessary to prepare the information required by Subsection (c);
 and
 (2)  hold public meetings to hear testimony from
 experts, stakeholders, and other interested parties regarding
 recommendations and proposals for establishing and implementing
 sustainable funding and a sustainable funding structure for the
 association.
 (b)  The board may request reports and other information as
 necessary to implement this section from:
 (1)  the department;
 (2)  the association; and
 (3)  experts, stakeholders, and other interested
 parties described by Subsection (a)(2).
 (c)  The board shall include in the report described by
 Section 2210.654 the board's findings regarding the current funding
 and funding structure of the association, problems with the funding
 and funding structure, and recommendations for legislative action
 related to the funding, funding structure, and sustainability of
 the association. The report must include:
 (1)  an analysis of the current funding, funding
 structure, and sustainability of the association, including the
 association's reliance on debt and reinsurance; and
 (2)  recommendations for legislative action necessary
 to:
 (A)  address problems with the current funding and
 funding structure of the association; and
 (B)  foster the stability and sustainability of
 the association.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 14(c) and (d), Chapter 790 (H.B. 1900),
 Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, are amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2023 [2021], the windstorm
 insurance legislative oversight board shall submit to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the Texas Department of Insurance a written
 report of a [the] study conducted under this section. The report
 must include the findings and legislative recommendations of the
 board.
 (d)  This section expires January 1, 2024 [2022].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *