Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1466 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2021

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1466


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enterprise zone program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2303.003, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (7) adding Subdivisions (8-a) and (8-b) to
 read as follows:
 (7)  "Qualified employee" means a person who:
 (A)  works for a qualified business;
 (B)  receives wages from the qualified business
 from which employment taxes are deducted; and
 (C)  performs at least 50 percent of the person's
 service for the business at the qualified business site, performs
 the person's service for the business pursuant to a qualified
 telework arrangement for the qualified business site and resides
 within 50 miles of the qualified business site, or if the person
 engages in the transportation of goods or services, the person
 reports to the qualified business site and resides within 50 miles
 of the qualified business site.
 (8-a)  "Qualified telework" means telework affiliated
 with the qualified business site and performed by an employee who is
 a resident of this state. The term does not include telework that
 occurs out of this state. To be considered qualified telework, a
 telework arrangement that requires more than 50 percent of work
 time to be completed through telework must be attributed to
 circumstances that do not allow the employee to work at least 50
 percent of the time at the qualified business site.
 (8-b)  "Telework" means the performance of services
 remotely through the use of email, Internet, and telephone from a
 person's residence.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2303.402(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person is a qualified business if the bank, for the
 purpose of state benefits under this chapter, or the nominating
 body of a project or activity of the person under this chapter, for
 the purpose of local incentives, certifies that:
 (1)  the person is engaged in or has provided
 substantial commitment to initiate the active conduct of a trade or
 business in an enterprise zone, and at least 25 percent of the
 person's new permanent jobs in the enterprise zone are held by:
 (A)  residents of any enterprise zone in this
 state;
 (B)  economically disadvantaged individuals; [or]
 (C)  veterans; or
 (D)  residents of an area in this state designated
 as a qualified opportunity zone under Section 1400Z-1, Internal
 Revenue Code of 1986.
 (2)  the person is engaged in or has provided
 substantial commitment to initiate the active conduct of a trade or
 business in an area of this state that does not qualify as an
 enterprise zone, and at least 35 percent of the person's new
 permanent jobs at the qualified business site are held by:
 (A)  residents of any enterprise zone in this
 state;
 (B)  individuals who are economically
 disadvantaged; [or]
 (C)  veterans; or
 (D)  residents of an area in this state designated
 as a qualified opportunity zone under Section 1400Z-1, Internal
 Revenue Code of 1986.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2303.406(h), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h)  A state benefit may not be obtained under this chapter
 or Chapter 151, Tax Code, for jobs moved to a qualified business
 site from any other business site [from one jurisdiction in this
 state to another jurisdiction] in this state.
 SECTION 4.  Section 2303.4072, Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2303.4072.  ENTERPRISE PROJECT CLAIM FOR STATE BENEFIT.
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a [A] person must make a
 claim to the comptroller for a state benefit as prescribed under
 this chapter and Chapter 151, Tax Code, not later than 18 months
 after the date on which the term of the enterprise project
 designation expires as provided by Section 2303.404.
 (b)  If the enterprise project term designation expired on or
 after March 1, 2020, and before March 2, 2021, the person must make
 the claim to the comptroller under Subsection (a) not later than 20
 months after the date the designation expired. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2303, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2303.409 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2303.409.  TEMPORARY WAIVER OF EMPLOYMENT HOURS
 REQUIREMENT. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the
 minimum requirement of annual employment hours for a new permanent
 job or a retained job as defined by Section 2303.401 is waived for
 any certification or retention period that includes any period
 beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2022, if the
 qualified business can show noncompliance was a result of the
 COVID-19 pandemic.
 (b)  This section expires December 31, 2023.
 SECTION 6.  Section 151.429, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsection (g-1) to read as
 follows:
 (g)  The refund provided by this section is conditioned on
 the enterprise project maintaining [at least] the baseline [same]
 level of employment of qualified employees as specified by the bank
 through the project's expiration [existed at the time it qualified
 for a refund for a period of three years from that] date. The
 comptroller shall [annually] certify whether that level of
 employment of qualified employees has been maintained. On
 certifying that the baseline level of employment specified by the
 bank [such a level] has not been maintained, the comptroller shall
 assess that portion of the refund attributable to any such decrease
 in employment, including penalty and interest from the date of the
 refund.
 (g-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (g), the level of
 employment of qualified employees required to be maintained by an
 enterprise project is waived for any period that includes any
 period beginning March 1, 2020, and ending December 31, 2022, if the
 qualified business shows that noncompliance with this requirement
 was due to the COVID-19 pandemic. This subsection expires January
 1, 2023.
 SECTION 7.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, the changes in law made by this Act apply only to an
 application for an enterprise project designation under Chapter
 2303, Government Code, as amended by this Act, that is submitted on
 or after the effective date of this Act. An application for an
 enterprise project designation that is submitted before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the application was submitted, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Section 2303.409, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 and Section 151.429(g-1), Tax Code, as added by this Act, apply to a
 claim for a state benefit made to the comptroller of public accounts
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.