Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1499
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1499 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the municipal disannexation of certain areas formerly
 designated as a census designated place.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.149 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.149.  DISANNEXATION OF CERTAIN ANNEXED AREAS
 FORMERLY DESIGNATED AS CENSUS DESIGNATED PLACE. (a) This section
 applies only to an annexed area that:
 (1)  contains:
 (A)  an access point to a greenbelt; and
 (B)  at least 1,200 single-family homes;
 (2)  is separated from two municipalities other than
 the municipality in which the area is located only by a highway; and
 (3)  before annexation:
 (A)  was part of a single census designated place;
 and
 (B)  was served by a municipal utility district
 that owned a water treatment and storage facility.
 (b)  A municipality shall disannex an area described by
 Subsection (a), including residential and commercial property in
 the area.
 (c)  If a water treatment and storage facility described by
 Subsection (a)(3) was transferred to the municipality during
 annexation, the municipality shall retain ownership of the facility
 after disannexation under this section.
 (d)  After an area is disannexed under this section:
 (1)  a special district located in and serving the area
 may be dissolved only if the members of the governing body of the
 district elect to dissolve the district after the disannexation;
 and
 (2)  an emergency services district that is adjacent to
 the area shall provide services to the area.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *