Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1524 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2021

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 1524
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 15, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 1; April 15, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1524 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a sales and use tax refund pilot program for certain
 persons who employ apprentices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.4292 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.4292.  TAX REFUND PILOT PROGRAM FOR CERTAIN PERSONS
 WHO EMPLOY APPRENTICES. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Executive director" means the executive director
 of the Texas Workforce Commission.
 (2)  "Qualified apprenticeship" means an
 apprenticeship program that is:
 (A)  certified as an industry-recognized
 apprenticeship program by an entity determined to meet United
 States Department of Labor criteria; or
 (B)  registered with the United States Department
 of Labor and qualified to receive funding provided through the
 Texas Workforce Commission under Chapter 133, Education Code.
 (b)  A person is eligible for a refund in the amount and under
 the conditions provided by this section of the taxes paid under this
 chapter during a calendar year if the person is certified by the
 executive director under Subsection (f) and employs at least one
 apprentice in a qualified apprenticeship position for at least
 seven months during the calendar year.  A person is not considered
 to be employed in a qualified apprenticeship position for purposes
 of this section:
 (1)  after the earlier of:
 (A)  the fourth anniversary of employment in the
 position; or
 (B)  the conclusion of the term of the
 apprenticeship position; or
 (2)  if the person was employed in another position by
 the employer immediately before beginning employment in the
 apprenticeship position.
 (c)  Subject to Subsections (d) and (e), the amount of the
 refund for a calendar year in connection with each apprentice
 described by Subsection (b) is $2,500.
 (d)  The total amount of the refund for a calendar year is
 equal to the lesser of:
 (1)  the amount allowed under Subsection (c) for the
 calendar year for each apprentice described by Subsection (b), not
 to exceed the maximum number of apprentices provided by Subsection
 (e); or
 (2)  the amount of sales and use taxes paid by the
 person during the calendar year.
 (e)  The maximum number of apprentices in connection with
 whom a person may receive a refund in a calendar year is:
 (1)  one; or
 (2)  not more than six if at least half of the
 apprentices employed are:
 (A)  foster children who have transitioned or are
 transitioning to independent living, as described in Section
 264.121, Family Code;
 (B)  military veterans, as defined by Section
 55.001, Occupations Code;
 (C)  military spouses, as defined by Section
 55.001, Occupations Code; or
 (D)  women.
 (f)  A person may not apply for a refund under this section
 unless the executive director certifies that the person is able to
 employ apprentices in qualified apprenticeships.  A person must
 apply to the executive director to obtain certification.  The
 executive director shall create an application form for the
 certification.
 (g)  The executive director may certify not more than 100
 persons under Subsection (f) at any time.  If the number of eligible
 applicants exceeds the limit provided by this subsection, the
 executive director shall select applicants for certification
 according to rules adopted under Subsection (h).
 (h)  The executive director shall adopt rules that establish
 merit-based criteria for selecting persons to certify from among
 those who apply. The rules must require that the executive director
 give preference to applicants who:
 (1)  offer qualified apprenticeships in areas of this
 state that are not designated as metropolitan statistical areas by
 the United States Office of Management and Budget; and
 (2)  provide training and skills development in
 emerging or developing occupational fields.
 (i)  The executive director shall issue a certificate to each
 person certified under Subsection (f). The certificate must
 confirm that the person is eligible to apply for a refund under this
 section.
 (j)  A person must apply to the comptroller for a refund
 under this section. The person must include with the application
 the certificate issued to the person under Subsection (i) and any
 other information the comptroller requires.
 (k)  Not later than September 1, 2024, the executive director
 shall prepare and deliver to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding
 officer of each legislative standing committee with primary
 jurisdiction over taxation a report that evaluates the effect of
 the pilot program on the employment outcomes and earnings of
 apprentices with respect to whom refunds are granted under the
 pilot program under this section.  The report must include a
 recommendation regarding whether the pilot program should be
 continued, expanded, or terminated.
 (l)  A person who applies for a refund under this section
 shall provide to the executive director information the executive
 director requests to prepare the report described by Subsection
 (k).
 (m)  This section expires December 31, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  A person may apply for a refund under Section
 151.4292, Tax Code, as added by this Act, only in connection with
 apprentices first employed on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Workforce Commission and the
 comptroller of public accounts are required to implement this Act
 only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose.  If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the commission and the comptroller
 may, but are not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for the purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *