Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1541 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1541
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 19, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1541 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of business case for major information
 resources projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2054.003, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (2-a) to read as follows:
 (2-a) "Business case" means a comparison of business
 solution costs and project benefits based on a solution assessment
 and validation for a major information resources project, which may
 include:
 (A)  alternative financing models, such as system
 as a service; and
 (B)  a readiness score of the project using an
 evidence-based scoring method delivered by an independent third
 party that includes measurement and corrective actions for the
 state agency's operational and technical strengths and weaknesses
 related to the project.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *