Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1590 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1590
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 23, 2021,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2;
 April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rules by the State Board for Educator Certification
 regarding virtual observation options for field-based experiences
 and internships required for educator certification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.051(f), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  The board shall propose rules providing flexible
 options for persons for any field-based experience or internship
 required for certification, including options for candidate
 observations to occur in virtual settings that are equivalent in
 rigor to in-person options for observation.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *