Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1590 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2021

                    S.B. No. 1590


 AN ACT
 relating to rules by the State Board for Educator Certification
 regarding virtual observation options for field-based experiences
 and internships required for educator certification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.051(f), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  The board shall propose rules providing flexible
 options for persons for any field-based experience or internship
 required for certification, including options for candidate
 observations that provide for at least:
 (1)  two observations to occur in person and two
 additional observations to occur in virtual settings that are
 equivalent in rigor to in-person options for observation; or
 (2)  three observations to occur in person.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1590 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1590 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135,
 Nays 10, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor